Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Prerelease and Reentry

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 (SB0115)
Title
Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 (SB0497)
Title
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131
Title
Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
Correctional Services – Geriatric Parole
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 (SB0898)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 (HB0068)
Title
Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0494 /CH0061 (HB0409)
Title
Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB0071)
Title
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852
Title
Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Release
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1331)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0068 (SB0115) Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program Delegate Branch, T. 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB0071 (SB0497) Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
Judicial Proceedings
HB0131 Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0235 Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0426 Correctional Services – Geriatric Parole Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0560 Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1233 Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2021) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1331 (SB0898) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0115 (HB0068) Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
SB0494 /CH0061 (HB0409) Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act) Senator West 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 61
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0497 (HB0071) Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0852 Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0868 Correctional Services - Inmate Release Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
SB0898 (HB1331) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page