Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Prerelease and Reentry

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0543 (SB0977)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Division of Correction – Data Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 (SB0776)
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 (SB0562)
Title
Correctional Services – Geriatric and Medical Parole
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Release
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339
Title
Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0600)
Title
Correctional Services - Geriatric and Medical Parole
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB0454)
Title
Correctional Services – Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0977 (HB0067/CH0543)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0543 (SB0977) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
Judiciary
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0127 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Division of Correction – Data Requirement Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0454 (SB0776) Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act) Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 (SB0562) Correctional Services – Geriatric and Medical Parole Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0736 Correctional Services - Inmate Release Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1120 Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0339 Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0600) Correctional Services - Geriatric and Medical Parole Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0776 (HB0454) Correctional Services – Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0977 (HB0067/CH0543) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page