Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Privatization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 (SB0415)
Title
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403 /CH0581 (SB0826/CH0580)
Title
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 (HB0278)
Title
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 /CH0580 (HB0403/CH0581)
Title
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0278 (SB0415) Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0403 /CH0581 (SB0826/CH0580) Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act) Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0746 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0415 (HB0278) Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0826 /CH0580 (HB0403/CH0581) Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act) Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page