Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Privileged Communications

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370
Title
Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 /CH0226
Title
Privileged Communications - Dissemination of News or Information by Certain Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 /CH0196 (SB0803/CH0195)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 (SB0805/CH0342)
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet Communications
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 /CH0195 (HB0641/CH0196)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 /CH0342 (HB1052)
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0370 Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 /CH0226 Privileged Communications - Dissemination of News or Information by Certain Persons Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0641 /CH0196 (SB0803/CH0195) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1052 (SB0805/CH0342) Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1221 Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet Communications Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0461 Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 /CH0195 (HB0641/CH0196) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 /CH0342 (HB1052) Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM
Click to return on the top page