Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Privileged Communications

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0134/CH0836)
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406
Title
Marriage - Confidential Communication
Sponsor
Delegate Simpson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 /CH0454 (SB0541/CH0455)
Title
Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 /CH0128
Title
Education - School Employee Antibias Training - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0836 (HB0297)
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0455 (HB0567/CH0454)
Title
Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0297 (SB0134/CH0836) Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding Delegate Davis 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0406 Marriage - Confidential Communication Delegate Simpson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0567 /CH0454 (SB0541/CH0455) Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024 Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Economic Matters
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1386 /CH0128 Education - School Employee Antibias Training - Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Ways and Means
2/26/2024 - 11:00 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0134 /CH0836 (HB0297) Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 836
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0541 /CH0455 (HB0567/CH0454) Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024 Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Finance
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page