Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Privileged Communications

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241 (SB0142)
Title
Marriage - Confidential Communication
Sponsor
Delegate Simpson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0135)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Fiduciaries - Attorney-Client Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331
Title
Consumer Protection - Artificial Intelligence
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0310)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Fiduciaries - Attorney-Client Privilege
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0142 (HB0241)
Title
Marriage - Confidential Communication
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0293)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases
Sponsor
Senator Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0241 (SB0142) Marriage - Confidential Communication Delegate Simpson 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/23/2025 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0310 (SB0135) Estates and Trusts - Fiduciaries - Attorney-Client Privilege Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
HB1331 Consumer Protection - Artificial Intelligence Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0135 (HB0310) Estates and Trusts - Fiduciaries - Attorney-Client Privilege Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0142 (HB0241) Marriage - Confidential Communication Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0274 (HB0293) Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases Senator Love 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/2/2025 4:55 PM
Click to return on the top page