Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Process Serving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253
Title
Final Protective Orders – Relief – Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1005 (SB0905)
Title
Action for Change of Name - Procedures and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0322
Title
Medical Malpractice - Notice of Intent to File Claim
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0905 (HB1005)
Title
Action for Change of Name - Procedures and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0253 Final Protective Orders – Relief – Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1005 (SB0905) Action for Change of Name - Procedures and Requirements Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2019 - 11:00 AM
HB1147 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0322 Medical Malpractice - Notice of Intent to File Claim Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0905 (HB1005) Action for Change of Name - Procedures and Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page