Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029)
Title
Family Law - Marriage of Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 (SB0429)
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Peace Orders - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 /CH0334 (SB0280/CH0335)
Title
Temporary Protective Orders - Electronic Filing and Video Conferencing Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360
Title
Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817 /CH0168
Title
Criminal Law – Violation of a Protective Order – Merger Prohibition and Separate Sentence Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Domestic Violence - Protective Orders - Status Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1344
Title
Workgroup to Study Extreme Risk Protective Orders (Sagar Ghimire Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0335 (HB0296/CH0334)
Title
Temporary Protective Orders - Electronic Filing and Video Conferencing Hearings
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375
Title
Crimes - Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications - Exception for Imminent Danger
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382
Title
Intercepted Communications - Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0110)
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029) Family Law - Marriage of Minors Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0110 (SB0429) Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0121 Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Peace Orders - Repeal Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0296 /CH0334 (SB0280/CH0335) Temporary Protective Orders - Electronic Filing and Video Conferencing Hearings Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Judiciary
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0360 Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0817 /CH0168 Criminal Law – Violation of a Protective Order – Merger Prohibition and Separate Sentence Authorization Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Domestic Violence - Protective Orders - Status Hearings Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1178 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1344 Workgroup to Study Extreme Risk Protective Orders (Sagar Ghimire Act) Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0280 /CH0335 (HB0296/CH0334) Temporary Protective Orders - Electronic Filing and Video Conferencing Hearings Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0375 Crimes - Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications - Exception for Imminent Danger Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 Intercepted Communications - Admissibility of Evidence Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0429 (HB0110) Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page