Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Psychiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131
Title
Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191 (SB0056)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537 (SB0398)
Title
Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 (SB0393)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070)
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0042
Title
Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0191)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307
Title
Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355
Title
Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0551)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 (HB0537)
Title
Mental Health Law - Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0191 (SB0056) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0537 (SB0398) Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Procedures Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0551 (SB0393) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070) Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021 Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0042 Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0056 (HB0191) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0307 Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/21/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0355 Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0393 (HB0551) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 (HB0537) Mental Health Law - Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Procedures Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:02 PM
Click to return on the top page