Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Publications -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 /CH0398 (SB0027/CH0397)
Title
Alzheimer’s Disease and Dementia – Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0196
Title
Public Schools and County Boards of Education - Publication of School Library Catalogs
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347
Title
Baltimore County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 (SB0399)
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517 (SB0460)
Title
Consumer Health Access Program for Mental Health and Addiction Care - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523
Title
St. Mary’s County – Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Definition
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064 (SB0816)
Title
Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082
Title
Public Health - Consumer Health Information - Hub and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176 (SB0859/CH0280)
Title
Public Health - Sickle Cell Disease Registry - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB0853)
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360
Title
Public Health - Abortion-Inducing Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141)
Title
Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027 /CH0397 (HB0166/CH0398)
Title
Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia - Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399 (HB0416)
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0447 (HB0383/CH0446)
Title
Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0517)
Title
Health - Insurance Coverage Information
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429)
Title
Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 (HB1270)
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0859 /CH0280 (HB1176)
Title
Public Health - Sickle Cell Disease
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 /CH0398 (SB0027/CH0397) Alzheimer’s Disease and Dementia – Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022) Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2022 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0196 Public Schools and County Boards of Education - Publication of School Library Catalogs Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0347 Baltimore County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0416 (SB0399) State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0517 (SB0460) Consumer Health Access Program for Mental Health and Addiction Care - Establishment Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0523 St. Mary’s County – Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Definition St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1064 (SB0816) Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1082 Public Health - Consumer Health Information - Hub and Requirements Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1176 (SB0859/CH0280) Public Health - Sickle Cell Disease Registry - Establishment Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1270 (SB0853) Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 Public Health - Abortion-Inducing Drugs Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141) Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0027 /CH0397 (HB0166/CH0398) Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia - Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022) Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0399 (HB0416) State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 /CH0447 (HB0383/CH0446) Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act) Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 (HB0517) Health - Insurance Coverage Information Senator Augustine 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2022 - 12:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429) Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0853 (HB1270) Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0859 /CH0280 (HB1176) Public Health - Sickle Cell Disease Senator Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page