Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Public Employees -see also- State Employees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 (SB0710)
Title
State and Local Government and Public Institutions of Higher Education - Teleworking
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0088)
Title
State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0211)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0602)
Title
Tort Claims Acts - Limits on Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 (SB0768)
Title
Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Labor and Employment - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 (HB0879)
Title
Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 (HB0304)
Title
State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0375)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB0721)
Title
Tort Claims Acts – Limits on Liability
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 (HB0073)
Title
State and Local Government and Private Employers - Teleworking
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB1088)
Title
Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0073 (SB0710) State and Local Government and Public Institutions of Higher Education - Teleworking Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
4/06/2021 - 2:50 PM
HB0304 (SB0088) State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0375 (SB0211) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0721 (SB0602) Tort Claims Acts - Limits on Liability Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1088 (SB0768) Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1321 Labor and Employment - Right to Work Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0069 (HB0879) Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0088 (HB0304) State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0211 (HB0375) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0602 (HB0721) Tort Claims Acts – Limits on Liability Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0710 (HB0073) State and Local Government and Private Employers - Teleworking Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0768 (HB1088) Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page