Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Public Local Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147 /CH0253 (SB0244)
Title
Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1116
Title
Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 15-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1478
Title
Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of Employer
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1636 /CH0314 (SB1164)
Title
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244 (HB0147/CH0253)
Title
Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0147 /CH0253 (SB0244) Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - Legalization Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0736 Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1116 Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 15-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
HB1478 Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of Employer Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1636 /CH0314 (SB1164) Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0244 (HB0147/CH0253) Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - Legalization Senator Mathias 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM
Click to return on the top page