Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 /CH0354 (SB0257/CH0355)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Tax–Free Period for Back–to–School Shopping – School Supplies and Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0582 /CH0281 (SB0294/CH0282)
Title
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612 (SB0496/CH0039)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792 (SB0904)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Alcoholic Beverages – Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 (SB0688)
Title
Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing and Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Alterations and Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Restaurant Utilities – Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149
Title
Small Business Tax Relief - State of Emergency Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Maryland Business Tax Relief Act
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Purpose Exemption - Seedlings and Fruit Trees
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094
Title
Public Health – Local Health District Boards
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 /CH0355 (HB0337/CH0354)
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Vendor Collection Credit – Job Training
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0294 /CH0282 (HB0582/CH0281)
Title
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Sewing Items
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB0869)
Title
Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing and Short–Term Vehicle Rentals – Alterations and Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904 (HB0792)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Study on Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0337 /CH0354 (SB0257/CH0355) Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0380 Sales and Use Tax – Tax–Free Period for Back–to–School Shopping – School Supplies and Textbooks Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0582 /CH0281 (SB0294/CH0282) Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0612 (SB0496/CH0039) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0792 (SB0904) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0796 Sales and Use Tax – Alcoholic Beverages – Rate Reduction Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0869 (SB0688) Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing and Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Alterations and Distribution Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0963 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety Devices Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0995 Sales and Use Tax – Restaurant Utilities – Exemption Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1019 Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1057 Sales and Use Tax – Rate Reduction Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1149 Small Business Tax Relief - State of Emergency Orders Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1209 Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1318 Maryland Business Tax Relief Act Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0011 Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Purpose Exemption - Seedlings and Fruit Trees Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 Public Health – Local Health District Boards Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0257 /CH0355 (HB0337/CH0354) Sales and Use Tax – Vendor Collection Credit – Job Training Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Budget and Taxation
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
SB0294 /CH0282 (HB0582/CH0281) Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Budget and Taxation
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0510 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Sewing Items Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0688 (HB0869) Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing and Short–Term Vehicle Rentals – Alterations and Distribution Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0904 (HB0792) Sales and Use Tax - Study on Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Senator Salling 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 4:01 PM
Click to return on the top page