Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 /CH0957 (SB0574/CH0958)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Extension of Sunset
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Baby Products - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Exemption for Trade-in Value of Portable Electronics
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0905
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Qualified Data Center Personal Property – Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Electric Bicycles and Electric Low Speed Scooters - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280 (SB1076)
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Electricity to Charge Electric Vehicles – Transportation Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294
Title
Artificial Intelligence Tools - Income Tax Credit and Sales and Use Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Precious Metal Bullion or Coins - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1414
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Licensure, Indoor Use, and Taxation - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1443
Title
Consumer and Display Fireworks – Regulation and Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 /CH0410
Title
Horse Racing - Racing Facility Ownership and Construction - Racing Operations
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Day - Veterans' Day
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 /CH0958 (HB0557/CH0957)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Extension of Sunset
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 /CH0791
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Nonprofit Organizations Maintaining Memorials - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622
Title
Community Reinvestment and Repair Fund - Funding (Maryland Reparations Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Exemption for Trade-in Value of Portable Electronics
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1076 (HB1280)
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Electricity to Charge Electric Vehicles – Transportation Trust Fund
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0557 /CH0957 (SB0574/CH0958) Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Extension of Sunset Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 957
Ways and Means
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0606 Sales and Use Tax - Baby Products - Exemption Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Exemption for Trade-in Value of Portable Electronics Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0905 Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Qualified Data Center Personal Property – Eligibility Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1072 Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate Alteration Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1075 Sales and Use Tax - Electric Bicycles and Electric Low Speed Scooters - Exemption Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1280 (SB1076) Sales and Use Tax – Electricity to Charge Electric Vehicles – Transportation Trust Fund Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1294 Artificial Intelligence Tools - Income Tax Credit and Sales and Use Tax Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 Sales and Use Tax - Precious Metal Bullion or Coins - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1414 Electronic Smoking Devices - Licensure, Indoor Use, and Taxation - Alterations Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
HB1443 Consumer and Display Fireworks – Regulation and Tax Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2024 - 11:00 AM
HB1524 /CH0410 Horse Racing - Racing Facility Ownership and Construction - Racing Operations Chair, Ways and Means Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
SB0176 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Day - Veterans' Day Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 /CH0958 (HB0557/CH0957) Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Extension of Sunset Senator Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 958
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 /CH0791 Sales and Use Tax - Nonprofit Organizations Maintaining Memorials - Exemption Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 791
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0622 Community Reinvestment and Repair Fund - Funding (Maryland Reparations Act of 2024) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Exemption for Trade-in Value of Portable Electronics Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1076 (HB1280) Sales and Use Tax – Electricity to Charge Electric Vehicles – Transportation Trust Fund Senator Corderman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2024 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page