Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 Applicants
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0606 /CH0700
Title
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0957 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0177 Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 Applicants Senator Manno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0363 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0606 /CH0700 Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page