Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933 (SB0566)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069
Title
Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 (HB0933)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0815 State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0933 (SB0566) Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
HB1069 Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 (HB0933) Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund Senator Elfreth 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 12:15 PM
Click to return on the top page