Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094 /CH0258
Title
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 /CH0506
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0424 (SB0304/CH0379)
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field Trips
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0093)
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1104 /CH0503 (SB0276)
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 (SB0928)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331
Title
Estate Fairness Act - Inheritance Tax Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 (HB0935)
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260
Title
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 (HB1104/CH0503)
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304 /CH0379 (HB0424)
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352
Title
Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding Extension
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism and Promotion of Agricultural Products
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 (HB1185)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0094 /CH0258 Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Ways and Means
2/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0112 /CH0506 Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Ways and Means
2/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0424 (SB0304/CH0379) Taxpayer Protection Act Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0463 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0842 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field Trips Delegate Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 (SB0093) Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection Requirement Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1104 /CH0503 (SB0276) Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1185 (SB0928) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 Estate Fairness Act - Inheritance Tax Repeal Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0093 (HB0935) Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection Requirement Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0260 Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds Senator Bates 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0276 (HB1104/CH0503) Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership Senator Madaleno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0304 /CH0379 (HB0424) Taxpayer Protection Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0352 Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding Extension Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism and Promotion of Agricultural Products Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 (HB1185) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page