Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Queen Anne's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0228 (SB0021)
Title
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756 /CH0273
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0855)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 (HB0187/CH0228)
Title
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB0841)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 /CH0228 (SB0021) Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0756 /CH0273 Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0841 (SB0855) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0021 (HB0187/CH0228) Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0855 (HB0841) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM
Click to return on the top page