Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Queen Anne's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 (SB0605)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 (SB0855)
Title
Queen Anne’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 (SB0854)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unannounced Visits by Inspectors
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Exceptions
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 (SB0680)
Title
Teachers’ Pension System – Vested Allowance – Break in Service
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605 (HB0225)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 (HB0929)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 (HB0349)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unannounced Visits by Inspectors
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB0323)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0225 (SB0605) Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0323 (SB0855) Queen Anne’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0349 (SB0854) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unannounced Visits by Inspectors Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0644 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Exceptions Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0655 Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 (SB0680) Teachers’ Pension System – Vested Allowance – Break in Service Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1117 Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 (HB0225) Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0680 (HB0929) State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0854 (HB0349) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unannounced Visits by Inspectors Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0855 (HB0323) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:19 PM
Click to return on the top page