Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Queen Anne's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391
Title
County Boards of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0335)
Title
Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975 (SB0877)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Circuit Court Judgeships
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235
Title
Queen Anne's County - Licensed Cannabis Dispensary and Processor Locations - Distance Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236
Title
Queen Anne's County - Municipalities - Speed Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB0975)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Circuit Court Judgeships
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0391 County Boards of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0892 (SB0335) Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0975 (SB0877) Queen Anne's County - Circuit Court Judgeships Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2025 - 3:00 PM
HB1235 Queen Anne's County - Licensed Cannabis Dispensary and Processor Locations - Distance Requirements Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1236 Queen Anne's County - Municipalities - Speed Limits Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2025 - 2:00 PM
SB0877 (HB0975) Queen Anne's County - Circuit Court Judgeships Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 11:10 AM
Click to return on the top page