Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Transportation - Highways (R1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems - Municipal Corporations - Statements and Certificates of Violation
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Cleanup - Records and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 (SB0140)
Title
State Highway Administration - Fallen Heroes Fishing Creek Bridge - Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Vehicle Laws - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems on Interstate 83 - Use of Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Prohibition on Trailers in Contraflow Lanes - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1006
Title
State Highway Administration - Vegetation Management - Pollinator Habitat Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038 (SB0734)
Title
Transportation - Highways - Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052
Title
Transportation – Consolidated Transportation Program – Scoring
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117
Title
State Highway Administration - Litter Collection and Mowing
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 (HB0311)
Title
State Highway Administration - Fallen Heroes Fishing Creek Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 (HB1038)
Title
Transportation - Highways - Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963
Title
Transportation - Study on Speed Limits - Interstate 495 and Connected Highways
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 Speed Monitoring Systems - Municipal Corporations - Statements and Certificates of Violation Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0252 State Highway Administration - Highway Cleanup - Records and Reporting Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0311 (SB0140) State Highway Administration - Fallen Heroes Fishing Creek Bridge - Designation Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0367 Vehicle Laws - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0512 Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems on Interstate 83 - Use of Revenue Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0659 Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Prohibition on Trailers in Contraflow Lanes - Study Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB1006 State Highway Administration - Vegetation Management - Pollinator Habitat Plan Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1038 (SB0734) Transportation - Highways - Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB1052 Transportation – Consolidated Transportation Program – Scoring Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0117 State Highway Administration - Litter Collection and Mowing Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2023 - 2:30 PM
SB0140 (HB0311) State Highway Administration - Fallen Heroes Fishing Creek Bridge Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Finance
2/01/2023 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0734 (HB1038) Transportation - Highways - Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0963 Transportation - Study on Speed Limits - Interstate 495 and Connected Highways Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/21/2023 10:48 AM
Click to return on the top page