Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 (SB0653)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967 (SB0914)
Title
Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants and Authorized Police Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0653 (HB0557)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB0967)
Title
Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0557 (SB0653) Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0967 (SB0914) Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1385 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants and Authorized Police Officers Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0653 (HB0557) Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 Vehicle Laws - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0914 (HB0967) Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/14/2022 9:58 AM
Click to return on the top page