Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285
Title
Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592
Title
State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Passenger Cars and Other Light-Duty Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1074 /CH0451 (SB0140/CH0452)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308
Title
Vehicle Laws - Delinquent Traffic Citations - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 /CH0452 (HB1074/CH0451)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377
Title
Vehicle Laws – Rental Vehicles – Provision of Spare Tires
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0285 Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0592 State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Passenger Cars and Other Light-Duty Vehicles Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (96-40)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1046 Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1074 /CH0451 (SB0140/CH0452) Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law) Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 451
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1308 Vehicle Laws - Delinquent Traffic Citations - Enforcement Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0140 /CH0452 (HB1074/CH0451) Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law) Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0377 Vehicle Laws – Rental Vehicles – Provision of Spare Tires Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:02 PM
Click to return on the top page