Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191 /CH0520 (SB0040/CH0521)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towed, Removed, or Abandoned Vehicles - Electronic Notice to Owner
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216
Title
Electric Vehicles - Repeal of Excise Tax Credit and Establishment of Rebate Program
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219
Title
Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Improper Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Addison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0405)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Fully Autonomous Vehicles – Human Safety Operators and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475 /CH0263 (SB0281/CH0264)
Title
Transportation Equality for Service Members Act
Sponsor
Delegate Allen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843
Title
Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicles - Right to Repair
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915
Title
Motor Vehicles - Out-of-State Drivers - Automated Enforcement (Out-of-State Driver Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392
Title
Vehicle Laws - Cannabis Use in Motor Vehicle With Minor Occupant - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Long, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465 /CH0527 (SB0941)
Title
Transportation-Related Tolls - Installment Payment Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0521 (HB0191/CH0520)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towed, Removed, or Abandoned Vehicles - Electronic Notice to Owner
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0264 (HB0475/CH0263)
Title
Transportation Equality for Service Members Act
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0405 (HB0439)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Fully Autonomous Vehicles - Human Safety Operators and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1465/CH0527)
Title
Transportation-Related Tolls - Installment Payment Plans
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0191 /CH0520 (SB0040/CH0521) Vehicle Laws - Towed, Removed, or Abandoned Vehicles - Electronic Notice to Owner Delegate Foley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2025 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0216 Electric Vehicles - Repeal of Excise Tax Credit and Establishment of Rebate Program Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0219 Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Improper Registration Delegate Addison 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 (SB0405) Vehicle Laws – Fully Autonomous Vehicles – Human Safety Operators and Reporting Requirements Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0475 /CH0263 (SB0281/CH0264) Transportation Equality for Service Members Act Delegate Allen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0843 Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicles - Right to Repair Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0915 Motor Vehicles - Out-of-State Drivers - Automated Enforcement (Out-of-State Driver Accountability Act) Delegate Foley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 Vehicle Laws - Cannabis Use in Motor Vehicle With Minor Occupant - Prohibition Delegate Long, R. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/05/2025 - 3:00 PM
HB1465 /CH0527 (SB0941) Transportation-Related Tolls - Installment Payment Plans Delegate Stewart 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0040 /CH0521 (HB0191/CH0520) Vehicle Laws - Towed, Removed, or Abandoned Vehicles - Electronic Notice to Owner Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2025 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0264 (HB0475/CH0263) Transportation Equality for Service Members Act Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0405 (HB0439) Vehicle Laws - Fully Autonomous Vehicles - Human Safety Operators and Reporting Requirements Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0941 (HB1465/CH0527) Transportation-Related Tolls - Installment Payment Plans Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/13/2025 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page