Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Racing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 /CH0203 (SB0533/CH0204)
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937 /CH0299 (SB0660/CH0300)
Title
State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 /CH0356
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0988
Title
Horse Racing – Development of Pimlico Racing Facility Communities – Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 /CH0167 (SB0919/CH0168)
Title
Horse Racing – Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 (HB0388)
Title
Use of Gaming Proceeds - Studies
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391
Title
Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 /CH0204 (HB0482/CH0203)
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0660 /CH0300 (HB0937/CH0299)
Title
State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 /CH0168 (HB1259/CH0167)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0482 /CH0203 (SB0533/CH0204) Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0937 /CH0299 (SB0660/CH0300) State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0940 /CH0356 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0988 Horse Racing – Development of Pimlico Racing Facility Communities – Memorandum of Understanding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB1259 /CH0167 (SB0919/CH0168) Horse Racing – Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0045 (HB0388) Use of Gaming Proceeds - Studies Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0391 Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0533 /CH0204 (HB0482/CH0203) Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0660 /CH0300 (HB0937/CH0299) State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0919 /CH0168 (HB1259/CH0167) Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:30 PM
Click to return on the top page