Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Recordation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013
Title
Real Property - Residential Contracts of Sale - Buyer Privacy Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Ruff
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 /CH0065 (SB0150/CH0066)
Title
Real Property – Recordation and Land Records – Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558
Title
Common Ownership Communities - Local Commissions
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625
Title
Real Property - Transfer-on-Death Deed - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 /CH0066 (HB0347/CH0065)
Title
Real Property - Recordation and Land Records - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513
Title
Real Property - Unlawfully Restrictive Covenant Modifications - County or Municipality Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 Real Property - Residential Contracts of Sale - Buyer Privacy Rights Delegate Ruff 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
HB0347 /CH0065 (SB0150/CH0066) Real Property – Recordation and Land Records – Requirements Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2025 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0558 Common Ownership Communities - Local Commissions Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0625 Real Property - Transfer-on-Death Deed - Establishment Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0150 /CH0066 (HB0347/CH0065) Real Property - Recordation and Land Records - Requirements Senator Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2025 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 Real Property - Unlawfully Restrictive Covenant Modifications - County or Municipality Notice Requirements Senator Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2025 4:57 PM
Click to return on the top page