Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 (SB0143)
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 (SB0321)
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150 (SB0124/CH0205)
Title
Public Schools - Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217
Title
Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 (SB0292)
Title
Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566
Title
School Construction – Design Documents – Waste Disposal Infrastructure
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700
Title
Environment – Products and Packaging – Labeling, Marketing, and Advertising for Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0788 (SB0522)
Title
State and Local Parks - Child Safe Zone Program - Establishment (Equitable Access to Safe Parks Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239
Title
Environment - Plastic and Glass Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331
Title
Coal Ash - Use, Recycling, and Management (Coal Ash Recycling Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124 /CH0205 (HB0150)
Title
Public Schools – Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0143 (HB0018)
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292 (HB0307)
Title
Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321 (HB0131)
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490
Title
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Solid Waste Stream - Alteration
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 (HB0788)
Title
State and Local Parks – Child Safe Zone Program – Establishment (Equitable Access to Safe Parks Act)
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813
Title
Income Tax – Calculation of Taxable Income – Investments in Sustainable Materials Management Projects
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 (HB1228/CH0030)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 (SB0143) Maryland Paint Stewardship Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0131 (SB0321) Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0150 (SB0124/CH0205) Public Schools - Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0217 Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0307 (SB0292) Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0566 School Construction – Design Documents – Waste Disposal Infrastructure Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0700 Environment – Products and Packaging – Labeling, Marketing, and Advertising for Recycling Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
HB0788 (SB0522) State and Local Parks - Child Safe Zone Program - Establishment (Equitable Access to Safe Parks Act) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1070 Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1239 Environment - Plastic and Glass Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB1331 Coal Ash - Use, Recycling, and Management (Coal Ash Recycling Act of 2022) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0124 /CH0205 (HB0150) Public Schools – Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0143 (HB0018) Maryland Paint Stewardship Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 (HB0307) Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0321 (HB0131) Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Solid Waste Stream - Alteration Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0522 (HB0788) State and Local Parks – Child Safe Zone Program – Establishment (Equitable Access to Safe Parks Act) Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 Income Tax – Calculation of Taxable Income – Investments in Sustainable Materials Management Projects Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0830 (HB1228/CH0030) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:27 AM
Click to return on the top page