Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Referendum

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0045
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042
Title
Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181
Title
Declaration of Rights - Religious Freedom, Religious Tests, and Oaths and Affirmations
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241
Title
Montgomery County - Damascus - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Referendum MC 12-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733
Title
Gaming – Video Lottery Operation License – Baltimore–Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847
Title
General Assembly - Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868
Title
Circuit Court for Howard County – Judges Sitting as Orphans’ Court Ho. Co. 06–22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951
Title
Estates and Trusts - Cross-Jurisdictional Probate Judges
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
Legislation - Spending Mandates - Three-Fifths Vote and Limited Duration Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024
Title
Court of Appeals – Chief Judge – Senate Confirmation
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895
Title
Declaration of Rights - Campaign Financing Right to Know
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012 /CH0016
Title
Congressional Districting Plan
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0045 Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 45
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0042 Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0181 Declaration of Rights - Religious Freedom, Religious Tests, and Oaths and Affirmations Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0241 Montgomery County - Damascus - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Referendum MC 12-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0733 Gaming – Video Lottery Operation License – Baltimore–Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0847 General Assembly - Term Limits Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 8:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2022 - 8:00 AM
HB0868 Circuit Court for Howard County – Judges Sitting as Orphans’ Court Ho. Co. 06–22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0951 Estates and Trusts - Cross-Jurisdictional Probate Judges Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0976 Legislation - Spending Mandates - Three-Fifths Vote and Limited Duration Requirement Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2022 - 8:00 AM
HB1171 Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty Delegate Jones, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 Court of Appeals – Chief Judge – Senate Confirmation Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Executive Nominations
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0895 Declaration of Rights - Campaign Financing Right to Know Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1012 /CH0016 Congressional Districting Plan President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Reapportionment and Redistricting
3/29/2022 - 8:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page