Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Referendum

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017
Title
Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Bouchat
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0037
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right to Organize
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Fee or Tax Rate Increases - Yea and Nay Vote of General Assembly Required (Taxpayer Disclosure and Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0505)
Title
Local Government - Municipal Annexation - Petition and Referendum
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0546)
Title
Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0788 (SB0619)
Title
Judiciary Department - Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Temporary Appointment
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0960
Title
Investor-Owned Electric, Gas, and Gas and Electric Companies - Cost Recovery - Limitations and Reporting Requirements (Ratepayer Freedom Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490 (SB0074)
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 (HB1490)
Title
Judges – Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289
Title
Baltimore City - Removal of Debt Ballot Questions
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340
Title
Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 (HB0532)
Title
Local Government - Municipal Annexation - Petition and Referendum
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 (HB0768)
Title
Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 (HB0788)
Title
Judiciary Department - Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Temporary Appointment
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725
Title
Charles County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License and Video Lottery Terminals
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954
Title
Circuit Court Judges and District Court Judges – Selection and Tenure
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB0028 Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule Delegate Bouchat 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
HB0037 Declaration of Rights - Right to Organize Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
1/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
HB0231 Constitutional Amendment - Fee or Tax Rate Increases - Yea and Nay Vote of General Assembly Required (Taxpayer Disclosure and Protection Act) Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 (SB0505) Local Government - Municipal Annexation - Petition and Referendum Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2025 - 1:30 PM
HB0768 (SB0546) Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0788 (SB0619) Judiciary Department - Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Temporary Appointment Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0960 Investor-Owned Electric, Gas, and Gas and Electric Companies - Cost Recovery - Limitations and Reporting Requirements (Ratepayer Freedom Act) Delegate Johnson, A. 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 03/17 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
Economic Matters
3/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1490 (SB0074) Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0074 (HB1490) Judges – Mandatory Retirement Age Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 Baltimore City - Removal of Debt Ballot Questions Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0340 Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2025 - 10:30 AM
SB0505 (HB0532) Local Government - Municipal Annexation - Petition and Referendum Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0546 (HB0768) Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request Senator James 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0619 (HB0788) Judiciary Department - Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Temporary Appointment Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0725 Charles County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License and Video Lottery Terminals Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 Circuit Court Judges and District Court Judges – Selection and Tenure Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2025 5:06 PM
Click to return on the top page