Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Registers of Wills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174 (SB0375)
Title
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0640 /CH0822 (SB0672/CH0823)
Title
Register of Wills - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770
Title
Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as Predecessor
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0174)
Title
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 (HB0556/CH0233)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 /CH0823 (HB0640/CH0822)
Title
Register of Wills - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0174 (SB0375) Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0640 /CH0822 (SB0672/CH0823) Register of Wills - Salary Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 822
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0770 Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as Predecessor Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0375 (HB0174) Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0466 (HB0556/CH0233) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 /CH0823 (HB0640/CH0822) Register of Wills - Salary Senator Zirkin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM
Click to return on the top page