Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Registers of Wills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245
Title
Inheritance Tax - Beneficiaries of Limited Means - Installment Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 /CH0220 (SB0022)
Title
Task Force to Study Fiduciary Adjudication in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 /CH0226 (SB0286/CH0227)
Title
Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623
Title
Estates and Trusts - Estate Administration - Publication of Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660
Title
Estates and Trusts - Register of Wills - Admission of Copy of Executed Will
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918 (SB0628)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420
Title
Registers of Wills - Appointment of Personal Representatives - Noncitizens
Sponsor
Delegate Woorman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 (HB0315/CH0220)
Title
Task Force to Study Fiduciary Adjudication in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286 /CH0227 (HB0323/CH0226)
Title
Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 (HB0918)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Salary
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0245 Inheritance Tax - Beneficiaries of Limited Means - Installment Payments Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0315 /CH0220 (SB0022) Task Force to Study Fiduciary Adjudication in Maryland Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Judiciary
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0323 /CH0226 (SB0286/CH0227) Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information Delegate Forbes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Judiciary
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0550 Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 Estates and Trusts - Estate Administration - Publication of Notice Delegate Embry 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 Estates and Trusts - Register of Wills - Admission of Copy of Executed Will Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0918 (SB0628) Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Salary Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 Registers of Wills - Appointment of Personal Representatives - Noncitizens Delegate Woorman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0022 (HB0315/CH0220) Task Force to Study Fiduciary Adjudication in Maryland Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0286 /CH0227 (HB0323/CH0226) Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2025 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0628 (HB0918) Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Salary Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/24/2025 10:46 AM
Click to return on the top page