Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0025
Title
Rehabilitation and Education for All Prisons (REAP) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0400 (SB0103/CH0399)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 /CH0331
Title
Commission to Study the Division of Rehabilitation Services (Student Job Training Reformation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0399 (HB0155/CH0400)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0025 Rehabilitation and Education for All Prisons (REAP) Act Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0155 /CH0400 (SB0103/CH0399) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2022 - 4:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0660 /CH0331 Commission to Study the Division of Rehabilitation Services (Student Job Training Reformation Act) Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0103 /CH0399 (HB0155/CH0400) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page