Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Reproductive Matters -see also- Abortion; Birth Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0279)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Local Health Departments and Community Action Agencies – Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758 (SB0684)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Public Health - Abortions - Prenatal Diagnosis of Down Syndrome (Down Syndrome Dignity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0925
Title
Workgroup on Medical Cannabis Use by Pregnant and Nursing Women
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997
Title
Equal Protection for Unborn Human Life Act
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
Health Occupations – Licensed Direct–Entry Midwives – Previous Cesarean Section
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1041
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Uniform Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0891)
Title
Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 (HB0396)
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0758)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 (HB1112)
Title
Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005
Title
Comprehensive Health Education Program – Female Monthly Cycle Tracking for Adolescent Girls
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0396 (SB0279) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0757 Local Health Departments and Community Action Agencies – Feminine Hygiene Products Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0758 (SB0684) Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0846 Public Health - Abortions - Prenatal Diagnosis of Down Syndrome (Down Syndrome Dignity Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
HB0925 Workgroup on Medical Cannabis Use by Pregnant and Nursing Women Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0997 Equal Protection for Unborn Human Life Act Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
HB1032 Health Occupations – Licensed Direct–Entry Midwives – Previous Cesarean Section Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1041 Health Occupations Boards - Uniform Reporting Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1112 (SB0891) Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
SB0279 (HB0396) Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 (HB0758) Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0891 (HB1112) Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 Comprehensive Health Education Program – Female Monthly Cycle Tracking for Adolescent Girls Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:28 PM
Click to return on the top page