Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Restaurants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 (SB0530)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0486)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 (SB0263)
Title
Health – Food Service Facilities – Beverage Options With Children’s Meals
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 /CH0757
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Restaurants
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840 /CH0759
Title
Howard County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Ho. Co. 13-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117 /CH0765
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B and D Licenses - Sidewalk Cafe/Patio Permit
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 /CH0768 (SB0645)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830/CH0574)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302
Title
Food Service Facility - Retailers of Prepackaged and Pre-Inspected Goods - Exclusion
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB0661)
Title
Health - Food Service Facilities - Beverage Options With Children's Meals
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0572)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0315
Title
Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0431)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB1180/CH0768)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 /CH0373 (HB1115)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Outdoor Table Service Privileges
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB1424)
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 /CH0574 (HB1228/CH0030)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 (SB0530) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Foley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0572 (SB0486) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0661 (SB0263) Health – Food Service Facilities – Beverage Options With Children’s Meals Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 /CH0757 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Restaurants Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 757
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 /CH0759 Howard County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Ho. Co. 13-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1070 Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 /CH0765 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B and D Licenses - Sidewalk Cafe/Patio Permit Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 765
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1180 /CH0768 (SB0645) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830/CH0574) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1302 Food Service Facility - Retailers of Prepackaged and Pre-Inspected Goods - Exclusion Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
SB0263 (HB0661) Health - Food Service Facilities - Beverage Options With Children's Meals Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0486 (HB0572) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0496 /CH0315 Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0431) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0645 (HB1180/CH0768) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0771 /CH0373 (HB1115) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Outdoor Table Service Privileges Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0782 (HB1424) Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0830 /CH0574 (HB1228/CH0030) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 5:00 PM
Click to return on the top page