Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Restrooms

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0577)
Title
Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classroom Video Recording Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0486)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772 (SB0494)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Energy and Water Efficiency Standards - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126 (SB0854)
Title
Graywater Systems - Public and Private Buildings - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1382
Title
Children - Family Child Care Homes and the Chief Medical Examiner - Use of Video Recording Devices and Reports (Bexley's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0572)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0577 (HB0226)
Title
Public Schools – Self–Contained Special Education Classroom – Use of Video Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 (HB1126)
Title
Graywater Systems – Public and Private Buildings – Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0226 (SB0577) Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classroom Video Recording Pilot Program Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0572 (SB0486) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0772 (SB0494) Maryland Energy Administration - Energy and Water Efficiency Standards - Alterations Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1126 (SB0854) Graywater Systems - Public and Private Buildings - Authorization Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1382 Children - Family Child Care Homes and the Chief Medical Examiner - Use of Video Recording Devices and Reports (Bexley's Law) Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0486 (HB0572) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0577 (HB0226) Public Schools – Self–Contained Special Education Classroom – Use of Video Recording Devices Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 (HB1126) Graywater Systems – Public and Private Buildings – Authorization Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 12:22 PM
Click to return on the top page