Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Review Boards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB0441)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Police Accountability Boards and Administrative Charging Committees - Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 (HB0991)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429)
Title
Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0991 (SB0441) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1184 Police Accountability Boards and Administrative Charging Committees - Municipal Corporations Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0309 Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0389 Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0441 (HB0991) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429) Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 4:52 PM
Click to return on the top page