Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Review Boards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032 (SB0043)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Forensic Review Board - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186
Title
Police Discipline - Trial Board Composition
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537 (SB0532)
Title
Police Discipline - Order to Show Cause
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043 (HB0032)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Forensic Review Board - Established
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0537)
Title
Police Discipline - Order to Show Cause
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 (SB0043) Maryland Department of Health - Forensic Review Board - Established Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Judicial Proceedings
HB0186 Police Discipline - Trial Board Composition Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0537 (SB0532) Police Discipline - Order to Show Cause Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0043 (HB0032) Maryland Department of Health - Forensic Review Board - Established Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB0537) Police Discipline - Order to Show Cause Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 10:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2025 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/3/2025 4:04 PM
Click to return on the top page