Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Right-of-Way

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 /CH0558 (SB0392)
Title
Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Authorizations and Requirements (Jay's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Crosswalks
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626
Title
Real Estate Development and Highway Rights-of-Way - Installation of Broadband Micro Conduits and Microducts
Sponsor
Delegate Taylor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645
Title
Transmission Line Siting - Comprehensive Plan, Recommendation, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657 (SB0483)
Title
Public Utilities - Alternatives to Construction of New Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829
Title
Public Utilities - Transmission Lines - Advanced Transmission Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0626 (SB0937/CH0625)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act)
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 (SB0909)
Title
Energy Resource Adequacy and Planning Act
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0375/CH0558)
Title
Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Authorizations and Requirements (Jay's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 (HB0657)
Title
Public Utilities - Alternatives to Construction of New Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853
Title
Public Service Commission - Transmission Line Siting - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 (HB1037)
Title
Energy Resource Adequacy and Planning Act
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 /CH0625 (HB1035/CH0626)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act)
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1043
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Revenue and Distribution (Maryland Mobility Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0375 /CH0558 (SB0392) Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Authorizations and Requirements (Jay's Law) Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0422 Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Crosswalks Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0626 Real Estate Development and Highway Rights-of-Way - Installation of Broadband Micro Conduits and Microducts Delegate Taylor 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0645 Transmission Line Siting - Comprehensive Plan, Recommendation, and Reporting Requirements Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0657 (SB0483) Public Utilities - Alternatives to Construction of New Transmission Lines Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 Public Utilities - Transmission Lines - Advanced Transmission Technologies Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1035 /CH0626 (SB0937/CH0625) Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act) Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Economic Matters
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1037 (SB0909) Energy Resource Adequacy and Planning Act Delegate Crosby 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0392 (HB0375/CH0558) Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Authorizations and Requirements (Jay's Law) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2025 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0483 (HB0657) Public Utilities - Alternatives to Construction of New Transmission Lines Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0853 Public Service Commission - Transmission Line Siting - Limitations Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 (HB1037) Energy Resource Adequacy and Planning Act Senator Hester 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0937 /CH0625 (HB1035/CH0626) Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act) President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB1043 Transportation Trust Fund - Revenue and Distribution (Maryland Mobility Act of 2025) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/28/2025 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page