Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Robbery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 (SB0165)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 /CH0520 (SB0586/CH0521)
Title
Baltimore City - Pretrial Release of Defendant - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Felony Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 (HB0294)
Title
Juvenile Court – Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 /CH0521 (HB0441/CH0520)
Title
Criminal Procedure and Public Safety - Courts and Criminal Justice in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Duties - Offenders Under Supervision (Parole and Probation Performance Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0294 (SB0165) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0441 /CH0520 (SB0586/CH0521) Baltimore City - Pretrial Release of Defendant - Notice Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0957 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Felony Convictions Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 (HB0294) Juvenile Court – Jurisdiction Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0586 /CH0521 (HB0441/CH0520) Criminal Procedure and Public Safety - Courts and Criminal Justice in Baltimore City Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0587 Division of Parole and Probation - Duties - Offenders Under Supervision (Parole and Probation Performance Act) Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 1:24 PM
Click to return on the top page