Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Rural Areas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 /CH0727 (SB0676)
Title
Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532
Title
Education – Driver’s Education Assistance Grant Program – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0642)
Title
Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 (SB1082)
Title
Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Ziegler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333 /CH0787
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity and Commission on Public Health - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0131
Title
Transportation - Consolidated Transportation Program - Categorization and Equitable Distribution of Projects
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0735)
Title
Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB0451/CH0727)
Title
Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786
Title
Task Force on Access to Pharmacy Services and the Impact of Telepharmacy in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0722
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1082 (HB1328)
Title
Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1142 /CH0804 (HB1506)
Title
Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0451 /CH0727 (SB0676) Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727
Ways and Means
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0532 Education – Driver’s Education Assistance Grant Program – Established Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0735 (SB0642) Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1328 (SB1082) Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement Delegate Ziegler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1333 /CH0787 Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity and Commission on Public Health - Revisions Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 787
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0131 Transportation - Consolidated Transportation Program - Categorization and Equitable Distribution of Projects Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0642 (HB0735) Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB0451/CH0727) Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0786 Task Force on Access to Pharmacy Services and the Impact of Telepharmacy in Maryland Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 /CH0722 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1082 (HB1328) Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1142 /CH0804 (HB1506) Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 804
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page