Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Rural Areas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 (SB0774)
Title
Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Broadband Service Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1040
Title
Real Property - Insufficient Condominium Reserve Account Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254 (SB0769)
Title
Community Eligibility Provision Expansion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335 (SB0910)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Venue License and Multiple Event Licenses
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 (HB1254)
Title
Community Eligibility Provision Expansion Program – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 (HB0969)
Title
Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Broadband Service Providers
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1335)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Venue License and Multiple Event Licenses
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0969 (SB0774) Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Broadband Service Providers Delegate Johnson, A. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1040 Real Property - Insufficient Condominium Reserve Account Grant Fund - Establishment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1254 (SB0769) Community Eligibility Provision Expansion Program - Establishment Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2025 - 1:30 PM
HB1335 (SB0910) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Venue License and Multiple Event Licenses Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/17/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0769 (HB1254) Community Eligibility Provision Expansion Program – Establishment Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0774 (HB0969) Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Broadband Service Providers Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0910 (HB1335) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Venue License and Multiple Event Licenses Caroline County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 11:30 PM
Click to return on the top page