Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Savings and Loan Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0532)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213 /CH0426
Title
Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0664)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0664 (SB0532) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0779 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1213 /CH0426 Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods Delegate Queen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB0664) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:08 PM
Click to return on the top page