Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Savings and Loan Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 (SB0689)
Title
Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Pruski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1151
Title
Residential Real Property Sales – Appraisals
Sponsor
Delegate Taylor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1557
Title
Program to Protect Individuals Unemployed or Furloughed Due to Federal Actions - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 (HB1018)
Title
Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1018 (SB0689) Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures Delegate Pruski 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1151 Residential Real Property Sales – Appraisals Delegate Taylor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1557 Program to Protect Individuals Unemployed or Furloughed Due to Federal Actions - Establishment Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0689 (HB1018) Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 10:08 PM
Click to return on the top page