Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 (SB0299/CH0078)
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 (SB0519)
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606
Title
Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Residency Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696 /CH0570 (SB0948)
Title
Public Utilities - Electric School Bus Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750 (SB0422)
Title
Education - Jobs That Require Driving - Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753 /CH0662 (SB0421)
Title
Primary and Secondary Schools - Bus Driver Wages - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 /CH0216
Title
Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1441
Title
Anne Arundel County – School Vehicles – Duration of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 (HB0753/CH0662)
Title
Primary and Secondary Schools – Bus Driver Wages – Study
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 (HB0750)
Title
Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0495)
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0695)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis Plan - Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948 (HB0696/CH0570)
Title
Public Utilities – Electric School Bus Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 (SB0299/CH0078) Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act) Delegate Kerr 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0283 Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0495 (SB0519) Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0606 Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Residency Restrictions Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0687 Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0696 /CH0570 (SB0948) Public Utilities - Electric School Bus Pilot Program Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
Finance
HB0750 (SB0422) Education - Jobs That Require Driving - Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022) Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0753 /CH0662 (SB0421) Primary and Secondary Schools - Bus Driver Wages - Study Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0813 /CH0216 Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1441 Anne Arundel County – School Vehicles – Duration of Operation Delegate Saab 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0421 (HB0753/CH0662) Primary and Secondary Schools – Bus Driver Wages – Study Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 (HB0750) Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0519 (HB0495) Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0552 (HB0695) Environment - Climate Crisis Plan - Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0948 (HB0696/CH0570) Public Utilities – Electric School Bus Pilot Program Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 10:52 AM
Click to return on the top page