Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Search and Seizure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188
Title
No–Knock Warrants – Elimination (Duncan’s Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0589)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Police Officers – Stop Procedures (Know Your Rights Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 (SB0159)
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0059
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 (SB0237)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 (SB0939)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 /CH0127
Title
Correctional Services - Warrant Apprehension Unit - Transfer
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0281)
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 (HB0240)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237 (HB0707)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Reform
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Search Warrants
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB0197)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Police Officers – Stop Procedures (Know Your Rights Act)
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1024)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0159 Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0188 No–Knock Warrants – Elimination (Duncan’s Act) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0197 (SB0589) Criminal Procedure – Police Officers – Stop Procedures (Know Your Rights Act) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0241 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Requirements Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0281 (SB0159) Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0488 Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0670 /CH0059 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0707 (SB0237) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Reform Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1024 (SB0939) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0118 /CH0127 Correctional Services - Warrant Apprehension Unit - Transfer Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0159 (HB0281) Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0187 (HB0240) Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0237 (HB0707) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Reform Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0419 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Search Warrants Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0589 (HB0197) Criminal Procedure – Police Officers – Stop Procedures (Know Your Rights Act) Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0939 (HB1024) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page