Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Search and Seizure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 /CH0542
Title
Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 (SB0550)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Criminal Procedure – No–Knock Search Warrants – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1054 (SB0784)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062 /CH0180 (SB0877)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0453)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0667
Title
Baltimore Police Department - Firearm Destruction, Seizure, and Recovery - Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1054)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 /CH0142
Title
Crimes - Firearms and Inmates - Enforcement, Procedures, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1062/CH0180)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0176 /CH0542 Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff Delegate Cardin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0453 (SB0550) Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act) Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0545 Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0651 Criminal Procedure – No–Knock Search Warrants – Repeal Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1054 (SB0784) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 /CH0180 (SB0877) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0453) Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0667 Baltimore Police Department - Firearm Destruction, Seizure, and Recovery - Reporting Requirement Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0784 (HB1054) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 /CH0142 Crimes - Firearms and Inmates - Enforcement, Procedures, and Reporting Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1062/CH0180) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 4:16 PM
Click to return on the top page