Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Security Alarms

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0055
Title
Public Safety – Licensed Firearms Dealers – Security Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0560 Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 /CH0055 Public Safety – Licensed Firearms Dealers – Security Requirements Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 55
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page