Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Security Alarms

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0737 (SB0287/CH0738)
Title
Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399
Title
Prince George's County - High School Metal Detector Program - Established PG 302-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 (SB0713)
Title
Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912
Title
Public Safety - Safe Neighborhoods Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0975/CH0768)
Title
Public Safety - Reproductive Health Care Clinic Security Grant Program - Establishment (Protecting Reproductive Health Care Clinics Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1443
Title
Consumer and Display Fireworks – Regulation and Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713 (HB0679)
Title
Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975 /CH0768 (HB1091)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Reproductive Health Care Clinic Security Grant Program - Establishment (Supporting Reproductive Health Care Clinics Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 /CH0737 (SB0287/CH0738) Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0399 Prince George's County - High School Metal Detector Program - Established PG 302-24 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
Ways and Means
HB0679 (SB0713) Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Economic Matters
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0912 Public Safety - Safe Neighborhoods Pilot Program Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 (SB0975/CH0768) Public Safety - Reproductive Health Care Clinic Security Grant Program - Establishment (Protecting Reproductive Health Care Clinics Act) Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1443 Consumer and Display Fireworks – Regulation and Tax Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0713 (HB0679) Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0975 /CH0768 (HB1091) Maryland Department of Health - Reproductive Health Care Clinic Security Grant Program - Establishment (Supporting Reproductive Health Care Clinics Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
Finance
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:38 PM
Click to return on the top page