Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB0853)
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361
Title
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722
Title
Medical Cannabis - Licensees - Ownership Limitation Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 (HB1270)
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1270 (SB0853) Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0722 Medical Cannabis - Licensees - Ownership Limitation Exemption Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0853 (HB1270) Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/23/2022 4:38 PM
Click to return on the top page