Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Sewage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077
Title
Environment - Driveway Sealers - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111
Title
Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0267
Title
Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0444 (SB0022/CH0445)
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862 /CH0510
Title
St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 /CH0278 (SB0701/CH0277)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921
Title
Baltimore County – Sewer Service Charge – Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 /CH0729
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water and Sewer Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 /CH0445 (HB0407/CH0444)
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 /CH0277 (HB0878/CH0278)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 Environment - Driveway Sealers - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0111 Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443) Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0267 Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0302 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 /CH0444 (SB0022/CH0445) On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0862 /CH0510 St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 510
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0878 /CH0278 (SB0701/CH0277) Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness Delegate Chang 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0921 Baltimore County – Sewer Service Charge – Adjustment Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1173 /CH0729 Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1221 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water and Sewer Liens Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0022 /CH0445 (HB0407/CH0444) On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 445
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442) Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0701 /CH0277 (HB0878/CH0278) Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page